There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Commending the efforts and honoring the work of the men and women of USNS Comfort and the United States Navy in the immediate response to those affected by the earthquake that struck Haiti on January 12, 2010.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/23/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H679-680)
01/27/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
02/23/2010-3:19pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/23/2010-3:19pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H679-680)
02/23/2010-2:59pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1048.
02/23/2010-2:59pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H679-683)
02/23/2010-2:59pmMr. McMahon moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
01/27/2010Referred to House Armed Services
01/27/2010Referred to House Foreign Affairs
01/27/2010Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/27/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (106)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/04/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 02/04/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 02/04/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/04/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 02/04/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/04/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/04/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/04/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/04/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/04/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/04/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/04/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/04/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/04/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/04/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 02/04/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/04/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/04/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/04/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/04/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/04/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/04/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/04/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/04/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 02/04/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/04/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/04/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 02/04/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/04/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/04/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/04/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/04/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/22/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/22/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/27/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services01/27/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1048.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1048. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (02/23/2010)

Expresses: (1) condolences and sympathy for the horrific loss of life and the physical and psychological damage caused by the January 2010 earthquake in Haiti; and (2) solidarity with Haitians, Haitian-Americans, and all those who have lost loved ones or have otherwise been affected by the tragedy.

Commends the assistance efforts of: (1) the people of the United States, including the Haitian-American community; and (2) the men and women of USNS Comfort and the U.S. Navy.