Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/03/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/03/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/09/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/19/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/23/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/23/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/25/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/25/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/25/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/25/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/25/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/25/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/25/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 03/25/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/13/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/25/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/26/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/15/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/21/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/21/2010