Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/04/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/09/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/11/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/12/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/12/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/16/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/17/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/17/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/17/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/17/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/17/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/17/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/17/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/17/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/17/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/17/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/17/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/21/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/19/2010