There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Congratulating Frank Buckles, America's last surviving WWI veteran, on his 109th birthday on February 1, 2010.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/02/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/02/2010Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/02/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/02/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 02/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/22/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/22/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/22/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/26/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 03/09/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/09/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/11/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/15/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/22/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/22/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/22/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/24/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/18/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/02/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1060.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1060. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/2010)

Congratulates Frank Buckles, America's last surviving World War I veteran, on his 109th birthday on February 1, 2010.