Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/03/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/03/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/03/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/03/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/23/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/23/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/23/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/23/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/23/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/11/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/14/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/14/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/14/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/30/2010