Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/15/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/27/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/13/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/19/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/19/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/20/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/20/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/20/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 05/20/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/25/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/25/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/25/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/25/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/25/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/25/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/25/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 05/25/2010