Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 02/04/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/04/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/22/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/22/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/22/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/22/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/23/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/24/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/24/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/26/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/03/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/03/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/19/2010