Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 02/09/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/22/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 02/22/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/22/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/22/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/22/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/22/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/22/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/22/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/22/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/22/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 02/22/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/22/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/25/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/26/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/26/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/02/2010