Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/23/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/26/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/04/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/04/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/04/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/04/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/04/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/04/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/09/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/09/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/10/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/10/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/12/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/16/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/19/2010