Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/23/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/23/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/23/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/09/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/22/2010