Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/24/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/09/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/09/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/09/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/11/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/12/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/12/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/12/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/12/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/12/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/12/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/12/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/12/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/12/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/12/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/12/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/12/2010