There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Commending the members of the 45th Agri-Business Development Team of the Oklahoma National Guard, for their efforts to modernize agriculture and sustainable farming practices in Afghanistan and their dedication and service to the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/25/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/23/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
02/25/2010Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
02/25/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/22/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/22/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/22/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/22/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/12/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/12/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/12/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/12/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/12/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/12/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/12/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/12/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/12/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/12/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/18/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/16/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/30/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/25/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/23/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1110. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/25/2010)

Commends the members of the 45th Agri-Business Development Team of the Oklahoma National Guard for their efforts to modernize agriculture and sustainable farming practices in Afghanistan and their dedication and service to the United States.