Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/22/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/22/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/22/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/22/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/12/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/12/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/12/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/12/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/12/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/12/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/12/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/12/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/12/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/12/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/18/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/16/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/30/2010