There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Designating March 2, 2010, as "Read Across America Day".


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/04/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 86).(text: CR 3/2/2010 H997-998)
02/25/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
03/22/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
03/04/2010-11:49amMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/04/2010-11:49amOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 86). (text: CR 3/2/2010 H997-998)
03/04/2010-11:39amConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1114-1115)
03/02/2010-4:16pmAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Courtney objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
03/02/2010-4:07pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1111.
03/02/2010-4:07pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H997-999)
03/02/2010-4:07pmMr. Courtney moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
02/25/2010Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
02/25/2010Introduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor02/25/2010 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education03/22/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1111. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/04/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Honors Theodor Geisel (Dr. Seuss) for his success in encouraging children to discover the joy of reading.

Honors the 13th anniversary of Read Across America Day, which occurs on March 2, 2010.

Encourages parents to read with their children for at least 30 minutes on Read Across America Day.