There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the goals and ideals of Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/21/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2738)
02/25/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
04/21/2010-12:26pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/21/2010-12:26pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2738)
04/21/2010-12:04pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1116.
04/21/2010-12:04pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2737-2740)
04/21/2010-12:04pmMrs. Capps moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
02/25/2010Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/25/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (108)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/02/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/02/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/02/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/03/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/03/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/04/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/04/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/04/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/04/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/04/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/04/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/09/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/09/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/09/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/09/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/09/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/09/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/09/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/09/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/10/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/10/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/12/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/12/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/12/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/12/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/18/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/18/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/21/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/21/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/21/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/21/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/21/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/22/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/25/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/14/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/14/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/14/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/14/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/14/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/21/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/21/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/25/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1116. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (04/21/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses support for the goals and ideals of Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week.

Reaffirms the nation's commitment to combating multiple sclerosis by promoting awareness about its causes and risks, promoting new education programs, supporting research, and expanding access to medical treatment.

Recognizes people living with multiple sclerosis and salutes the health care professionals and medical researchers who assist those so afflicted and continue to work to find cures and improve treatments.