Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/02/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/02/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/02/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/03/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/03/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/04/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/04/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/04/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/04/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/04/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/04/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/09/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/09/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/09/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/09/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/09/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/09/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/09/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/09/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/10/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/10/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/12/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/12/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/12/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/12/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/18/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/18/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/21/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/21/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/21/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/21/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/21/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/22/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/25/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/14/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/14/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/14/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/14/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/14/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/21/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/21/2010