Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/26/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/22/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/09/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/14/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/22/2010