Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/25/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/25/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/25/2010
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/25/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/14/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/14/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/06/2010