There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the University of Arizona's 125 years of dedication to excellence in higher education.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/15/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 0 (Roll no. 112).(text: CR H1401)
03/09/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
03/22/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
03/15/2010-7:04pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/15/2010-7:04pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 0 (Roll no. 112). (text: CR H1401)
03/15/2010-6:32pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1408-1409)
03/15/2010-2:15pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/15/2010-2:08pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1145.
03/15/2010-2:08pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1401-1402)
03/15/2010-2:08pmMs. Hirono moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
03/09/2010Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
03/09/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/10/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/10/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/10/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/10/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/10/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/10/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/10/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/10/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/10/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/10/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/10/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/11/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/11/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/09/2010 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness03/22/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1145.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1145. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/15/2010)

Recognizes the University of Arizona for 125 years of dedication to excellence in higher education.

Thanks the school for its contribution to the betterment of this country.