Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/20/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/27/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/04/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/13/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/13/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/13/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/13/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/13/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/13/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/13/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/13/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/13/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/13/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/13/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/13/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/13/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/13/2010