Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/11/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/11/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/11/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/11/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/12/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/12/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/17/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/17/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/17/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/06/2010