Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/10/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/12/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/12/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/15/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/17/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/17/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/18/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/18/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/05/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/05/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/05/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/05/2010