Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/15/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/15/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/16/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/23/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/28/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/19/2010