Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/24/2010