Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/11/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/11/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/16/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/16/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/16/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/16/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/16/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/16/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/16/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/16/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/16/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/16/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/16/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/17/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/17/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/17/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/17/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/17/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/17/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/17/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/17/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/17/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/17/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/17/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/17/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/17/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/17/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/24/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/24/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/15/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/15/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/15/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/14/2010