Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/24/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/24/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/24/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/24/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/25/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/25/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/13/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/14/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/14/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/14/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/14/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/14/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/15/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/21/2010