Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/23/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/24/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/26/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/20/2010