Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/20/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/20/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/13/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/13/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/24/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/24/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/25/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/27/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/08/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/08/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/15/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/16/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/16/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/22/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/22/2010