Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/25/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/20/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/27/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/08/2010