Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/22/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/26/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/26/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/26/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/26/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/28/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/28/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/29/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/04/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/04/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/04/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/04/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/04/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/06/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/11/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/11/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/25/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/25/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/28/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/09/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/16/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/16/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/17/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/23/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/30/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/14/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/21/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/21/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 08/10/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 08/10/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/14/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/14/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 09/20/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/20/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/20/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/22/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/22/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/22/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/23/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/28/2010