Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/21/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/22/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/06/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/24/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/27/2010