Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/13/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/14/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/20/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/21/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/27/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/27/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/27/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/27/2010