Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/13/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/26/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/26/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/26/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/24/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/24/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/24/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/24/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/24/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/24/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/24/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/24/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/24/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/24/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/24/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/24/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/24/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/24/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/24/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/24/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/24/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/28/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/29/2010