Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/29/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/29/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/29/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/29/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/29/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/29/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/04/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/12/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/30/2010