Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/14/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/22/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/22/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/22/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/27/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/27/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/27/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/27/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/27/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/27/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/27/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/27/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/27/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/27/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/27/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/27/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/27/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/27/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/27/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/29/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/29/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/04/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/05/2010