Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/09/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/11/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/11/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 02/11/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/11/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/11/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/11/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/11/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/11/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/11/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/11/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/12/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 02/13/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/13/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/13/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/13/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/13/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/13/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/13/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/13/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/13/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/23/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/23/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/24/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/24/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/03/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/06/2009