Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/21/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/05/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/12/2010