Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 04/14/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/20/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/21/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/21/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/21/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/21/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/21/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/21/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/26/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/26/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/26/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/04/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/04/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/04/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/04/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/26/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/26/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/26/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/26/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/28/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/17/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/01/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/20/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/20/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/20/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/21/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/26/2010