Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/15/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/20/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/20/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/20/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/20/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/20/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/20/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/20/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/20/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/20/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/20/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/20/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/20/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/20/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/22/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/26/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/26/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/12/2010