Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/04/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/16/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/15/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/21/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 08/10/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/16/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 11/16/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/16/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/16/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/16/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/16/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/16/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/16/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/16/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/16/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/29/2010