Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/15/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/26/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/26/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/26/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/27/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/06/2010