There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress with respect to the National Day of Prayer.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/20/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/20/2010Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
04/20/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/22/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/22/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/28/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/28/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/28/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/28/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/28/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/28/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/05/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/13/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/19/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/30/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform04/20/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1273.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1273. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/20/2010)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that the National Day of Prayer is constitutional, a needed tribute to the value of prayer, and a fitting acknowledgment of our nation's religious history.