Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/20/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 04/20/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/21/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/22/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/26/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/27/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/24/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/01/2010