Text: H.Res.1288 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/22/2010)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 111th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 1288 Introduced in House (IH)]

111th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 1288

 Urging the issuance of a certificate of loss of nationality for Anwar 
                               al-Awlaki.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             April 22, 2010

Mr. Dent (for himself, Mr. Cantor, Mr. McCaul, Mr. Austria, Mr. Roe of 
 Tennessee, Mr. Coffman of Colorado, Mr. Franks of Arizona, Mr. Posey, 
   Mr. Gerlach, Mr. Rooney, Mr. Upton, Mr. Bartlett, Mrs. Miller of 
   Michigan, Mr. Broun of Georgia, Mr. Bilirakis, Mr. Olson, and Mr. 
 Pitts) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
                       Committee on the Judiciary

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Urging the issuance of a certificate of loss of nationality for Anwar 
                               al-Awlaki.

Whereas Anwar al-Awlaki was born in Las Cruces, New Mexico, on April 22, 1971, 
        and is therefore a citizen of the United States;
Whereas al-Awlaki is also a citizen of the Republic of Yemen, who was raised 
        there from 1971 until 1991, and after living and studying in the United 
        States for more than a decade, again returned to Yemen in 2004;
Whereas al-Awlaki, through his indoctrination, incitement, and radicalization of 
        persons recruited into the service of al Qaeda and related 
        organizations, has functioned as a member of al Qaeda since before the 
        attacks of September 11, 2001, and thereby sought to carry out terrorist 
        acts and otherwise engage in hostilities against the United States;
Whereas al-Awlaki, while acting as a Muslim cleric and as an imam at the Rabat 
        mosque and the Dar al Hijrah mosque, counseled several of the 9/11 
        hijackers;
Whereas al-Awlaki seeks to radicalize persons from around the world and recruit 
        on behalf of al Qaeda by broadcasting messages over the Internet, 
        including audio recordings and postings from ``Imam Anwar's Blog'' which 
        incite his followers to carry out attacks against the United States on 
        behalf of his radical views;
Whereas, in January 2009, Awlaki published ``44 Ways to Support Jihad'', which 
        preaches that al-Awlaki's ``culture of martyrdom needs to be revived 
        because the enemy of Allah fears nothing more than our love of death'', 
        and ``it is necessary for you to join a group that has Jihad as its main 
        objective'';
Whereas, on November 5, 2009, Major Nidal Hasan, who sought spiritual guidance 
        from and communicated with al-Awlaki, killed 13 people and wounded 30 
        others in cold blood at Fort Hood, Texas, an act which al-Awlaki later 
        praised as ``heroic'';
Whereas al-Awlaki has furthered his teachings by interpreting and translating 
        into English the writings and theories of Yousef al-Ayyiri, who founded 
        al Qaeda's operational network in Saudi Arabia and acted as the 
        mastermind behind the May 2003 suicide bombings in Riyadh;
Whereas, on December 25, 2009, Umar Farouk Abdulmutallab, a Nigerian national, 
        attempted to destroy Northwest Airlines flight 253, admitted to FBI 
        interrogators that he had been trained by an al Qaeda branch in Yemen 
        and had carried out his unsuccessful bombing attempt under direct orders 
        from al-Awlaki, confirming that al-Awlaki was much more than a spiritual 
        advisor, but rather a facilitator and supervisor of terrorist 
        operations;
Whereas, on or about March 18, 2010, al-Awlaki, voluntarily and in his own 
        voice, incited all Muslims, including his fellow U.S. citizens, to 
        commit treason by taking up arms against the United States, stating 
        emphatically, ``jihad against America is binding upon myself, just as it 
        is binding on every other Muslim''; and
Whereas as he did when inciting and commanding Umar Farouk Abdulmutallab, Anwar 
        al-Awlaki remains acting as an operative for al Qaeda's conspiracy to 
        overthrow, put down, or to destroy by force the Government of the United 
        States: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives urges that a 
certificate of loss of nationality should be issued by the appropriate 
diplomatic or consular officer for approval by the Secretary of State 
and forwarded to U.S. Citizen and Immigration Services finding that 
Anwar al-Awlaki voluntarily relinquished his status as a United States 
citizen--
            (1) by voluntarily participating in and collaborating with 
        Armed Forces seeking to carry out hostilities against the 
        United States;
            (2) by inciting peaceful Muslims to join al Qaeda in jihad 
        against the United States by engaging in acts of violence 
        against the people of the United States;
            (3) by teaching members and supporters of al Qaeda and 
        related organizations subject to the Authorization for the Use 
        of Military Force (Public Law 107-40 (2001)), that they have a 
        duty to engage in acts of terrorism against the people of the 
        United States; and
            (4) by participating in al Qaeda's call for the violent 
        overthrow of the Government of the United States.
                                 <all>