Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/27/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/27/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/27/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/27/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/27/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/27/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 04/27/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/27/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/27/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/27/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 04/27/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/28/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/29/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/29/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/29/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/04/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/18/2010