Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/27/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/27/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 04/27/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 04/27/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/04/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/04/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/04/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/04/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/04/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/04/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/18/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/18/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/18/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/19/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/19/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/19/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/20/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/24/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/24/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/25/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/27/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/27/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/08/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/10/2010