Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/20/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/10/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/2010