Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/30/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/22/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/29/2010