Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/18/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/16/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/22/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/22/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/30/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 06/30/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/30/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/01/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/22/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/20/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/23/2010