Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/06/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/11/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/11/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/11/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/11/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/11/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/11/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/11/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/11/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/13/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/13/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/13/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/19/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/19/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/25/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/25/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/25/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/28/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/28/2010